Case Last Refreshed: 45 minutes ago
Chaplin, Justin, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Cockrell, Lina Balciunas, Messing, Gary M, against California Department Of Forestry And Fire, California State Personnel Board, represented by Gittisriboongul, Alvin, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Harold E. Kahn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHarold E. Kahn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 28, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMarch 28, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a legal case involving petitioners Justin Chaplin, James Michels, and Frank Schonig against the California State Personnel Board and the California Department of Forestry and Fire Protection (CAL FIRE). The petitioners are seeking a...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF HAND DELIVERY RE: NTC OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON REMAND; NTC OF ISSUANCE; ETC (TRANSACTION ID # 100131332) FILED BY PETITIONER CHAPLIN, JUSTIN | |
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100131388), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PETITIONER CHAPLIN, JUSTIN SERVED MAY-12-2021, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON CORPORATION, MAILING DATE MAY-14-2021 AS TO RESPONDENT CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF FORESTRY AND FIRE PROTECTION | |
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON REMAND FILED BY PETITIONER (TRANSACTION ID # 100130878) | |
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ISSUANCE OF ORDER ON REMAND (TRANSACTION ID # 100130878) FILED BY PETITIONER CHAPLIN, JUSTIN | |
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MANDAMUS ON REMAND (TRANSACTION ID # 100130878) FILED BY PETITIONER CHAPLIN, JUSTIN | |
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER WRIT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MANDAMUS ON REMAND | |
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED THAT THE PEREMPTORY WRIT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MANDAMUS SHALL BE SERVED ON THE SPB AND REAL PARTY IN INTEREST CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF FORESTRY AND FIRE PROTECTION BY PERSONAL SERVICE. THE COURT RETAINS JURISDICTION TO ENFORCE THE PROVISIONS OF THIS JUDGMENT UNTIL COMPLIANCE IS ACHIEVED. THE COURT'S JURISDICTION SHALL TERMINATE UPON ITS APPROVAL OF THE STATE PERSONNEL BOARD'S RETURN TO THE WRIT ISSUED THEREIN. SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS. | |
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER ON REMAND | |
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event | REMITTITUR FILED A155107 DIV 1 | |
May 14, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATION NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.