Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Diaz, Benito filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Douglas K Mann presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDouglas K Mann Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 05, 2021 |
CategoryConservatorship - Person |
Last RefreshedMarch 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2023 |
Department S35 - SBJC
Judge: Mann, Douglas K |
||
December 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: Court has read and considered CI report filed 12/21/22. Court sets OSC re: Dismissal on 3/14/2023, at 10:00 am, in department S35. |
|
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Report of No Report by Court Investigator Filed CI CEE'S DEATH |
|
August 31, 2022 | Hearing | Conservatorship Investigator Review Re: Annual | |
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Claim Fwd to Fin & Adm Off/Indigent Defense for Payment in the amount of $1312.50 |
|
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Claim Received, Verified and Forwarded to Dept S35 |
|
April 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Court Appointed Attorney Claim Received from Sandy Turner in the amount of $1312.50 for 05/12/21 to 03/28/22 |
|
March 28, 2022 |
Department S35 - SBJC
Judge: Mann, Douglas K |
||
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Stipulation & Order re: Appointment of Judge Pro Tem filed | |
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Remove Attorney from Case -SANDY TURNER is relieved. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.