Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts with Reilly, Tara presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeReilly, Tara Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 21, 2021 |
CategoryConservatorship - Person |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2022 | Hearing | Conservatorship Investigator Review Re: Annual | |
December 14, 2021 | Hearing | Conservatorship Compliance Review Hearing Judicial Officer Reilly, Tara Hearing Time 10:00 AM | |
November 18, 2021 | Hearing | Determination of Conservatee's Appropriate Level of Care | |
November 18, 2021 | Hearing | Notice of Conservatee's Rights Filed | |
August 31, 2021 | Hearing | Order Signed | |
August 31, 2021 | Hearing | Petition Granted | |
August 31, 2021 | Hearing | Letters Issued - Conservatorship Comment PERSON | |
August 31, 2021 | Hearing | Order Appointing Conservator Filed - Person | |
August 31, 2021 | Hearing | Hearing on Petition for Conservatorship View Document **PR - Portal Minute Order Judicial Officer Reilly, Tara Hearing Time 10:00 AM Result Held | |
June 29, 2021 | Hearing | Citation and Proof of Service Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.