Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Montgomery, Rosemarie Ann, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Michelle Gilleece presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichelle Gilleece Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 24, 2021 |
CategoryConservatorship - Person & Estate |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2024 | Docket Event | Conservatorship Investigator Review Re: Biennial | |
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service DOCUMENTS SERVED: ORDER ON SECOND AND FINAL ACCOUNT ; 06/29/2023 & 07/07/2023; -SEE ATTACHED- ; CLASS MAIL |
|
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt Filed ATTORNEYS RECEIPT; GREGORY ZUMBRUNN |
|
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt Filed ATTORNEYS RECEIPT; ROSE C ROSADO |
|
June 28, 2023 |
Department S36 - SBJC
Judge: Gilleece, Michelle |
||
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Accounting Approved Second and Final Account |
|
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed SUPPLEMENT TO SECOND AND FINAL ACCOUNT |
|
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: SECOND AND FINAL ACCOUNT REPORT OF CONSERVATOR OF THE PERSON AND ESTATE |
|
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Signed | |
March 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.