Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Bandholtz, Kathryn Ann, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Damian Garcia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDamian Garcia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management3529 days |
Filing DateSeptember 11, 2007 |
CategoryConservatorship Of The Person |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
|
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Objection Filed
Date: December 03, 2014Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 22, 2022Accounting Report Filed
Date: August 10, 2012Order Settling Accounting and Report Filed
Date: January 20, 2015Imaged Documents Filed prior to 12/31/1995
Date: December 31, 2008Imaged Documents Filed prior to 12/31/1995
Date: December 31, 2007Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: November 05, 2014Notice of Hearing
Date: November 07, 2016Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: November 29, 2016Report Filed
Date: May 09, 2017Order Settling Accounting and Report Filed
Date: January 16, 2019Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: October 22, 2020Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: October 14, 2020Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: February 24, 2021Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: March 04, 2021Accounting Report Filed
Date: June 29, 2021Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: August 24, 2021Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: August 28, 2012Order Settling Accounting and Report Filed
Date: September 12, 2012Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed
Date: November 21, 2012Notice Sent re:
Date: December 10, 2012Comment:
Date: June 27, 2016Order Filed Re:
Date: August 23, 2016Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: August 18, 2016Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: August 05, 2016Accouting and Supporting Documents Filed
Date: October 26, 2010Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 03, 2014Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: December 17, 2014Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: December 30, 2014Notice of Hearing
Date: December 13, 2018Imaged Documents Filed prior to 12/31/1995
Date: December 31, 2009Accounting Report Filed
Date: November 03, 2016Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: November 02, 2016Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: January 02, 2019Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: October 24, 2016Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: January 10, 2019Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: December 09, 2016Proof of Service Filed
Date: February 14, 2017Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: February 07, 2017Order Settling Accounting and Report Filed
Date: December 14, 2016Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: May 04, 2017Notice Sent re:
Date: June 27, 2011Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: June 27, 2017Notice of Court Action Mailed to Defendant
Date: May 03, 2012Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: July 13, 2017Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: September 12, 2014Accounting Report Filed
Date: September 24, 2014Notice of Hearing
Date: September 30, 2014Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: October 03, 2014Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: October 22, 2014Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: October 27, 2014Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: February 17, 2022Order Approving Accounting Filed
Date: April 21, 2022Accounting Not Filed-Hearing Set
Date: April 19, 2023Accounting Report Filed
Date: June 20, 2023Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: April 18, 2017Imaged Documents Filed prior to 12/31/1995
Date: October 26, 2010Petition (Probate) Filed
Date: July 25, 2017Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: August 29, 2017Notice of Hearing
Date: July 27, 2017Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: September 06, 2017Order Filed Re:
Date: September 12, 2017Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: August 25, 2014Receipt Filed
Date: September 26, 2017Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: November 30, 2018Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: November 19, 2018Accounting Report Filed
Date: December 04, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: December 03, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2025 | Docket Event | Conservatorship Investigator Review Re: Biennial | |
November 02, 2023 |
Department F1 - Fontana
Judge: Garcia, Damian |
||
November 02, 2023 |
Department S37 - SBJC
Judge: Garcia-Rodrigo, Candice |
||
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Court Investigator's Report Filed (Confidential) Medical Information |
|
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Report to Court of Annual or Biennial Review Filed | |
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Filed | |
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Filed | |
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: | |
June 26, 2023 |
Department S37 - SBJC
Judge: Garcia-Rodrigo, Candice |
||
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Accounting Report Filed SEVENTH AND FINAL ACCT AND REPORT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.