Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cavalry Spv I Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Winn Law Group, A Professionalcorporation, Winn Law Group, A Professional Corporation, against Vanessa Conkrite, represented by Law Offices Of Robert S. Gitmeid,Pc, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Christopher B. Harmon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher B. Harmon Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2020 |
CategoryCollection Crc 3.740-Under $10,000 |
Last RefreshedNovember 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Notice of Settlement of Entire Case filed - Conditional Settlement CRC 3.1385 (05A*RMCCON) Form CM-200.
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: July 18, 2022System Generated Notice re: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING REGARDING DISMISSAL.
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: July 20, 2022System Generated Notice re: Notice of Department Assignment.
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Summons Issued on Complaint (Collections - Corona) of CAVALRY SPV I LLC and filed.
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Under $10,000. CRC 3.740 filed. (Corona)
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference - Collections - filed.
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: Notice of Order to Show Cause Hearing.
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92505-2545.
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.