Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bank Of America N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Suttell & Hammer Apc, against Shannon Irene Vargas, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Christopher B. Harmon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher B. Harmon Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 13, 2019 |
CategoryCollection Crc 3.740-Under $10,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 11, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
System Generated Notice re: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT.
Date: December 13, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: December 11, 2020Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 91752-2726.
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Under $10,000. CRC 3.740 filed. (Corona)
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Declaration of NON SERVICE filed
Date: December 27, 2019Summons Issued on Complaint (Collections - Corona) of BANK OF AMERICA N.A. and filed.
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING.
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Declaration of NON SERVICE filed
Date: January 02, 2020Plaintiff's Declaration In Support Of Order To Show Cause Hearing
Date: December 10, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.