Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Vaca, Keri Anne, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryPetition For Change Of Name |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
DECREE CHANGING NAME GRANTED FILED BY PETITIONER VACA, KERI ANNE
Date: December 03, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | DECREE CHANGING NAME GRANTED FILED BY PETITIONER VACA, KERI ANNE | |
March 15, 2022 | Hearing | NAME CHANGE CALENDAR | |
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION (SAN FRANCISCO DAILY JOURNAL) (TRANSACTION ID # 67357449) | |
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY PETITIONER VACA, KERI ANNE HEARING SET FOR MAR-15-2022 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 103N | |
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event | **** AMENDED *** PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY PETITIONER VACA, KERI ANNE | |
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | DECREE CHANGING NAME GRANTED FILED BY PETITIONER VACA, KERI ANNE | |
October 19, 2021 | Hearing | NAME CHANGE CALENDAR | |
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION (SAN FRANCISCO DAILY JOURNAL) | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME PROPOSED NAME: WILLOW J STAR FILED BY PETITIONER VACA, KERI ANNE HEARING SET FOR OCT-19-2021 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 103N | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME, RESIDENCY VERIFIED, FILED BY PETITIONER VACA, KERI ANNE JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.