Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Cavalry Spv I, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Zeller, Stephen S., against Mcgregor, Mark A, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions254 days |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time254 days |
Conversion Action
Date: September 11, 2015Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit
Date: May 18, 2017Complaint
Date: December 31, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment issued Amount: $2,520.44 |
|
November 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Return County: BURBANKStatus: UnsatisfiedIssued on: 111717Amount: 3088.26 Writ of Execution Return County: BURBANK Status: Unsatisfied Issued on: 111717 Amount: 3088.26 |
|
May 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interest 368 Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interest 368.86. |
|
May 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued to the County of LOS ANGELES Issued On: 5-18-17 Amount: 2,914.30 |
|
September 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING USE OF COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS,SIGNED BY RL, ON 09/10/15, FILED. Conversion Action OGCL: ORDER GRANTING USE OF COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS,SIGNED BY RL, ON 09/10/15, FILED. |
|
September 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute PRI: PRINCIPAL IS $2,225.44. |
|
September 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute COSTS: COSTS ARE $295.00. |
|
September 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute JFP: JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC FOR CAVALRY SPV I, LLC |
|
September 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute JAGD: JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC AGAINST MARK A MCGREGOR |
|
September 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute INT: INTEREST IS $0.00. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.