Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cal Coast Credit Service Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Blonski, Kadin W., against Bassett, Stephen, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 26, 2014 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions325 days |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time325 days |
Complaint
Date: December 26, 2014Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: September 29, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Return County: LOS ANGELESStatus: Partially SatisfiedIssued on: 03/01/2016Amoun Writ of Execution Return County: LOS ANGELES Status: Partially Satisfied Issued on: 03/01/2016 Amount: $2,232.73 |
|
September 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment | |
March 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued WEM: WRIT OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,232.73 |
|
March 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute *FEE: 160302-0228-CK 141/ 25.00 PAYMT |
|
March 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM OF INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $48.62 FILED BY CAL COAST CREDIT SERVICE INC Conversion Action MI: MEMORANDUM OF INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $48.62 FILED BY CAL COAST CREDIT SERVICE INC |
|
March 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED. FORMER ATTORNEY REBECCA S. PARKER REMOVED AS TO CAL COAST CREDIT SE Substitution of Attorney as to SAT: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED. FORMER ATTORNEY REBECCA S. PARKER REMOVED AS TO CAL COAST CREDIT SERVICE INC AND REPLACED WITH ATTORNEY KADIN W. BLONSKI. |
|
November 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY FILED BY CAL COAST CREDIT SERVICE INC Declaration DLT: DECLARATION IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY FILED BY CAL COAST CREDIT SERVICE INC |
|
November 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR COURT/CLERK JUDGMENT AS TO STEPHEN BASSETT FILED BY CAL COAST CREDIT SERVICE INC. Conversion Action RCJ: REQUEST FOR COURT/CLERK JUDGMENT AS TO STEPHEN BASSETT FILED BY CAL COAST CREDIT SERVICE INC. |
|
November 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute PRI: PRINCIPAL IS $955.60. |
|
November 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED ON 11/16/15 AS FOLLOWS: Judgment by Clerk JDCL: JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED ON 11/16/15 AS FOLLOWS: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.