Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Cach,Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Mandarich, Chris D, against Baker, Christopher, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 12, 2013 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections - 10,000 - 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions339 days |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time339 days |
This complaint is filed by CACH, LLC against Christopher Baker and Does 1 through 10. The plaintiff alleges breach of contract and common counts. The plaintiff, CACH, LLC, is a Colorado Limited Liability Company and the assignee of the original credi...
Complaint
Date: July 12, 2013Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the -WITHOUT prejudice
Date: June 16, 2014Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit
Date: August 20, 2014Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: January 12, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT AS TO COMPLAINT OF CACH,LLC FILED Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment ASJ2: ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT AS TO COMPLAINT OF CACH,LLC FILED |
|
January 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Action JST: JUDGMENT ENTERED 06/16/14 -- SATISFIED |
|
October 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY, FILED. Document FILED: RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY, FILED. |
|
February 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF ATTORNEY CHRIS D MANDARICH FILED Notice of Change of Address of Attorney NCA: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF ATTORNEY CHRIS D MANDARICH FILED |
|
August 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILE Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit MCAIC1: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY CACH,LLC. INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $204.77, COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 --- |
|
August 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued WEM: WRIT OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY IN THE AMOUNT OF $13,116.10 |
|
August 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Conversion Action CREDIT: --- CREDITS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00. |
|
August 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute *FEE: 140820-0611-CK 141/ 25.00 PAYMT |
|
June 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT OF CACH,LLC WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the -WITHOUT prejudice REQD1: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT OF CACH,LLC WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. |
|
June 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY FILED BY CACH,LLC Declaration DLT: DECLARATION IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY FILED BY CACH,LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.