Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cach, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Vos, Ryan E., against Toscano, Catherine, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 17, 2012 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions575 days |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time575 days |
Conversion Action
Date: January 07, 2015Conversion Action
Date: May 15, 2014Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: August 11, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT AS TO COMPLAINT OF CACH, LLC FILED Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment ASJ2: ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT AS TO COMPLAINT OF CACH, LLC FILED |
|
August 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Action COMM: THE JUDGMENT CREDITOR HAS ACCEPTED PAYMENT. |
|
July 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY, FILED. Document FILED: RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY, FILED. |
|
March 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute *FEE: 150304-0126-CK 141/ 25.00 PAYMT |
|
March 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment issued AI1: (L) ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED |
|
February 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF ATTORNEY RYAN E VOS FILED Notice of Change of Address of Attorney NCA: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF ATTORNEY RYAN E VOS FILED |
|
January 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM OF INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $165.05 FILED BY CACH, LLC Conversion Action MI: MEMORANDUM OF INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $165.05 FILED BY CACH, LLC |
|
January 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued WEM: WRIT OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,867.45 |
|
January 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute *FEE: 150107-0124-CK 141/ 25.00 PAYMT |
|
November 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Conversion Action COMM: CLERK JUDGMENT PACKET RETURNED - (COURT JUDGMENT WAS PREVIOUSLY ENTERED ON 5/15/14). |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.