Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
State Farm Generalinsurance Co, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Hull, Jack D., against Yanovsky, Daniel B, Yanovsky, Leonid, represented by Sarapinian, Arsen, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Susan I. Etezadi presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSusan I. Etezadi Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2011 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1163 days |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time1163 days |
This complaint is filed by State Farm General Insurance Company against Leonid Yanovsky, Daniel B. Yanovsky, and Does 1 through 10. State Farm alleges that it is a corporation authorized to do business in California. The defendants are believed to re...
Declaration
Date: February 08, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: February 22, 2018Motion
Date: January 23, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Appearance and Examination 08/22/2018 Appearance and Examination Judge: Etezadi, Susan I. |
|
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION |
|
July 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Application and Order for Appearance and Examination Judgment Debtor: LEONID YANOVSKY Application and Order for Appearance and Examination Judgment Debtor: LEONID YANOVSKY |
|
July 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Application and Order for Appearance and Examination Judgment Debtor: DANIEL B YANOVSKY Application and Order for Appearance and Examination Judgment Debtor: DANIEL B YANOVSKY |
|
June 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Application & Order for Appearance & Examination Forward to DEPARTMENT 18- JUDGE ETEZADI 2 APPLICATIONS AND ORDERS WERE SENT FOR SAME CASE NUMBER. CHECKS ARE IN SAFE. |
|
June 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Type: RE: MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULTSigned by: JUDGE BUCHWALDDate Signed: 06/18/18 Order Type: RE: MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT Signed by: JUDGE BUCHWALD Date Signed: 06/18/18 |
|
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order sent for signature to Judicial Officer 10 - ORDER FOR MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Motion for Assignment Order 02/26/2018 Motion for Assignment Order Judge: Buchwald, Gerald J. |
|
February 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Set Aside Default/Judgment
Judge: Buchwald, Gerald J. |
|
February 23, 2018 | Tentative Ruling |
DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT/JUDGMENT · DENIED. Defendants Daniel and Lionid Yanovsky’s Motion to Set Aside Default and Default Judgment is DENIED. The Motion is untimely as to any and all ...
Judge: GERALD J. BUCHWALD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.