Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Udr Texas Properties, Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Segnit, Daniel R, against All Other Occupants In Possession, Dunn, Michael, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Steven L. Dylina presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSteven L. Dylina Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
Category(32) Limited Residential Unlawful Detainer - Under 10,000 |
Time To Trial54 days |
Last RefreshedJune 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time75 days |
Conversion Action
Date: February 23, 2015Conversion Action
Date: February 04, 2015Declaration
Date: March 16, 2015Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit
Date: November 30, 2015Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit
Date: April 12, 2017Conversion Action
Date: March 16, 2015Order
Date: March 16, 2015Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the -WITHOUT prejudice
Date: February 04, 2015Answer (Limited up to $10,000)
Date: January 05, 2015Complaint
Date: December 31, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interest Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interest |
|
February 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Return County: San FranciscoStatus: UnsatisfiedIssued on: 11/30/15Amount: 10570 Writ of Execution Return County: San Francisco Status: Unsatisfied Issued on: 11/30/15 Amount: 10570.58 |
|
November 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILE Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit MCAIC1: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY UDR TEXAS PROPERTIES, LLC. INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $630.24, COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 --- |
|
November 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute *FEE: 151130-0662-CK 141/ 25.00 PAYMT |
|
November 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF UDR TEXAS PROPERTIES, LLC FILED ASSOCIATING DANIEL R SEGNIT W Conversion Action AA: ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF UDR TEXAS PROPERTIES, LLC FILED ASSOCIATING DANIEL R SEGNIT WITH CURRENT COUNSEL OF RECORD DANIEL R SEGNIT |
|
November 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued WEM: WRIT OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY IN THE AMOUNT OF $10,570.58 |
|
November 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Action CREDIT: --- CREDITS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00. |
|
March 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION OF NON-COMPLIANCE AND JUDGMENT FILED BY UDR TEXAS PROPERTIES, LLC Declaration DECL: DECLARATION OF NON-COMPLIANCE AND JUDGMENT FILED BY UDR TEXAS PROPERTIES, LLC |
|
March 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
STIPULATED JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS: Conversion Action SJE: STIPULATED JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS: |
|
March 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING JUDGMENT TO BE ENTERED, SIGNED BY JUDGE J, SCOTT ON 03/13/15, FILED. Order O: ORDER GRANTING JUDGMENT TO BE ENTERED, SIGNED BY JUDGE J, SCOTT ON 03/13/15, FILED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.