Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Sanchez, Marleni, Argueta, Manuel, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Lau, John William, against Martin, Gabriela, represented by Clasen, Raffalow And Rhoads, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Christopher J. Warner presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher J. Warner Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management149 days |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryPi Motor Vehicle |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time540 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2010 | |||
June 24, 2010 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
June 21, 2010 | |||
June 17, 2010 | |||
May 14, 2010 | |||
May 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
Vacate Hearing Scheduled VACATE MANSC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 05/14/10 AT 01:30 IN DEPARTMENT S35. |
|
May 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED BY MANUEL ARGUETA, MARLENI SANCHEZ. |
|
May 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
Vacate Hearing Scheduled VACATE READI HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 06/17/10 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S35. |
|
May 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
Vacate Hearing Scheduled VACATE JT HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 06/21/10 AT 09:30 IN DEPARTMENT S35. |
|
May 11, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment: CASE TRACKED TO S35 FOR HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.