Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Arellano, Lino A, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by M W Roth, Plc, against Hsbc Bank Usa, National Association As Trustee On Behalf Of The Holders Of The Optemac, Quality Loan Service Corporation, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Janet M. Frangie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJanet M. Frangie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management149 days |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryReal Property |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time373 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2010 |
Judge: Frangie, Janet M |
||
January 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes 0RDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED BY LINO A ARELLANO. JANET M FRANGIE PRESIDING. CLERK: THERESA HANDYSIDE COURT REPORTER CYNTHIA GARCIA;12152 COURT ATTENDANT B AUTEN - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEA |
|
January 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment: CASE TRACKED TO S32 FOR HEARING |
|
September 25, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE TRANSFERRED TO NEW DEPARTMENT | |
August 19, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE TRANSFERRED TO NEW DEPARTMENT | |
May 29, 2009 | |||
May 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
May 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
Vacate Hearing Scheduled VACATE CMC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 05/29/09 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S34. |
|
May 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
Comment: CASE TRACKED TO S34 FOR HEARING |
|
May 04, 2009 | Docket Event | RETURN MAIL: MINUTE ORDER OF PREDIPOSITION HRG RECEIVED BACK FROM STATE BAR. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.