Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Capital One F.S.B., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Stanton, Troy William, against Latham Jr, Dewitt A., in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Paul M. Bryant presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaul M. Bryant Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management149 days |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryCollections |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions65 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time105 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 06, 2009 |
Judge: Bryant, Paul M, Jr. |
||
August 03, 2009 | Docket Event |
Comment: CASE TRACKED TO S36 FOR HEARING |
|
July 24, 2009 | Docket Event | ORAP RETURNED SERVED AS TO DEWITT A. LATHAM JR. | |
July 21, 2009 | Docket Event | ORAP RETURNED SERVED AS TO DEWITT A. LATHAM JR. | |
May 29, 2009 | |||
May 14, 2009 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED. 090514-1336-CK MMF/ 40.00 PAYMT 090514-1336-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 4504 | |
May 12, 2009 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY CAPITAL ONE F.S.B. FOR ISSUANCE OF ABSTRACT 090512-1442-CK MJF/ 15.00 PAYMT 090512-1442-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 4479 | |
May 07, 2009 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED | |
April 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued - San Bernardino WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY. ( $57208.78 ) 090428-3514-CK MJF/ 15.00 PAYMT 090428-3514-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 4441 |
|
April 28, 2009 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED 090428-3481-CK MJF/ 15.00 PAYMT 090428-3481-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 4440 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.