Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts with Andreen, Kenneth presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAndreen, Kenneth Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 09, 2010 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2011 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Comment OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 | |
March 15, 2011 | Hearing | OSC Re: Status of Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 Original Type OSC Re: Status of Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 Hearing Time 8:30 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 | |
November 05, 2010 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Andreen, Kenneth Comment HEARING RE: OSC RE DISMISSAL (SERVICE) KENNETH ANDREEN,JUDGE CLERK: LESLIE RICHARDSON COURT ATTENDANT R ARAGON NOT REPORTED - APPEARANCES: INC COLLECTION AT LAW, FOR WELLS FRGO BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT PRESENT - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD ON COURT'S MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO APPEAR/NO PROOF OF SERVICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSCECUTION BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) NOTICE GIVEN BY COURTROOM CLERK. === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
November 05, 2010 | Hearing | Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): View Document REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE Comment REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): THIS CASE WAS DISMISSED BY THE COURT. | |
November 05, 2010 | Hearing | Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: Comment CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF 11/5/10 MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD | |
November 05, 2010 | Hearing | Hearing Re: Original Type Hearing Re: Judicial Officer Andreen, Kenneth Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Held Comment HEARING RE: OSC RE DISMISSAL (SERVICE) | |
October 05, 2010 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Hildreth, Martin A Comment HEARING RE: OSC RE DISMISSAL (PLTF'S FTA) MARTIN A HILDRETH,JUDGE CLERK: LESLIE RICHARDSON COURT REPORTER DEENA MACIAS;9826 COURT ATTENDANT E ROBLES - APPEARANCES: SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY LAVONNA HAYASHI FOR PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL. OUT FOR SERVICE AT NEW ADDRESS. IF PROOF OF SERVICE OR A SIGNED ORDER FOR PUBLICATION HAS NOT BEEN FILED PRIOR TO THE 11/5/10 HEARING THE COURT WILL DISMISS THE CASE. - PROCEEDINGS: HEARING RE:OSC RE DISMISSAL (SERVICE) SET FOR 11/05/10 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R11. === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
October 05, 2010 | Hearing | Hearing Re: Original Type Hearing Re: Judicial Officer Hildreth, Martin A Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Continued Party's motion Comment HEARING RE: OSC RE DISMISSAL (PLTF'S FTA) | |
September 29, 2010 | Hearing | Filing Fee Paid by Comment FILING FEE PAID BY WELLS FRGO BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR SANCTIONS 100929-2165-CK FSA/ 100.00 PAYMT | |
August 31, 2010 | Hearing | Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: Comment CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF 8/31/10 MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.