Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Great Senecafinancial Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Wolpoff & Abramson, Llp, against Suzette G. Pomeroy, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with Lewis A. Davis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLewis A. Davis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management134 days |
Filing DateDecember 05, 2005 |
CategoryContract - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time196 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
OFFICIAL COURT FILE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GC68152 AND GC68153 Not Applicable |
|
August 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED Not Applicable |
|
June 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY GREAT SENECA FINANCIAL CORPORATION Not Applicable |
|
June 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Vacated |
|
June 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION Not Applicable |
|
June 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
CIVIL SAD BEFORE HEARING - REQ. DISM. - NO ADR Not Applicable |
|
April 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Minutes Completed |
|
March 29, 2006 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY ATTY FOR PLA Not Applicable |
|
March 29, 2006 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: CMC STATEMENT Not Applicable |
|
March 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: CMC STATEMENT Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.