Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Great Seneca Financial Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Wolpoff & Abramson, Llp, against Sheree L Neeley, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with Lewis A. Davis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLewis A. Davis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management161 days |
Filing DateNovember 21, 2005 |
CategoryContract - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time193 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
OFFICIAL COURT FILE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GC68152 AND GC68153 Not Applicable |
|
August 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED Not Applicable |
|
July 07, 2006 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Vacated |
|
June 02, 2006 | Docket Event |
CIVIL SAD BEFORE HEARING - REQ. DISM. - NO ADR Not Applicable |
|
June 02, 2006 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION Not Applicable |
|
May 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Minutes Completed |
|
January 25, 2006 | Docket Event |
CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE Vacated |
|
November 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
CASE ENTRY COMPLETED Not Applicable |
|
November 21, 2005 | Docket Event | CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 1/25/06 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 4CLK | |
November 21, 2005 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 5/01/06 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 13 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.