Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Edgar Ruiz Prado filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with Charles S. Treat presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCharles S. Treat Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 06, 2021 |
CategoryCivil Harassment |
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON REQUEST FOR RESTRAINING ORDERS RE: CIVIL HARASSMENT, FILED BY JORGE TELLEZ - Minutes DROPPED BY COURT |
|
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
FILE RETURNED TO COURT RECORDS, MARTINEZ Not Applicable |
|
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event | HEARING ON REQUEST FOR RESTRAINING ORDERS RE: CIVIL HARASSMENT, FILED BY JORGE TELLEZ - Minutes | |
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
5CHARP CALENDARED ON 12/09/21 IN DEPT. PITT. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 12/09/21 IN DEPT. 50. Not Applicable |
|
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON REQUEST FOR RESTRAINING ORDERS RE: CIVIL HARASSMENT, FILED BY JORGE TELLEZ - Minutes NOT HEARD/CONT |
|
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event | HEARING ON REQUEST FOR RESTRAINING ORDERS RE: CIVIL HARASSMENT, FILED BY JORGE TELLEZ - Minutes | |
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
FILE IN PITTSBURG Not Applicable |
|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
APPLICATION & ORDER FOR RE-ISSUANCE OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER FILED BY JORGE TELLEZ Not Applicable |
|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON REQUEST FOR RESTRAINING ORDERS RE: CIVIL HARASSMENT, FILED BY JORGE TELLEZ - Minutes NOT HEARD/CONT |
|
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
COLOR OF FILE IS PINK Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.