Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Gabriel, Andrew V filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with Brian F. Haynes presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrian F. Haynes Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 04, 2021 |
CategoryCivil Harassment |
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON REQUEST FOR RESTRAINING ORDERS RE: CIVIL HARASSMENT, FILED BY ISAIAH ABBATIELLO - Minutes NOT HEARD/CONT |
|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON REQUEST FOR RESTRAINING ORDERS RE: CIVIL HARASSMENT, FILED BY ISAIAH ABBATIELLO - Minutes DISMISSED |
|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | HEARING ON REQUEST FOR RESTRAINING ORDERS RE: CIVIL HARASSMENT, FILED BY ISAIAH ABBATIELLO - Minutes | |
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
5CHARR CALENDARED ON 11/16/21 IN DEPT. RICH. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 11/16/21 IN DEPT. 03. Not Applicable Judge: Brian F. Haynes |
|
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON REQUEST FOR RESTRAINING ORDERS RE: CIVIL HARASSMENT, FILED BY ISAIAH ABBATIELLO - Minutes NOT HEARD/CONT |
|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON REQUEST TO CONTINUE HEARING FILED Not Applicable |
|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
REQUEST TO CONTINUE COURT HEARING FILED BY ISAIAH ABBATIELLO Not Applicable |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | HEARING ON REQUEST FOR CIVIL HARASSMENT RESTRAINING ORDER SCHEDULED FOR 10/26/21 AT 8:30, IN DEPT. %%X% | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
CIVIL HARASSMENT TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER FILED BY ISAIAH ABBATIELLO Not Applicable |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
CASE ENTRY COMPLETE Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.