Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Karen Nunn filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts Superior with Charles S. Treat presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCharles S. Treat Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2021 |
CategoryCivil Harassment |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 23, 2021 | Docket Event | HEARING ON REQUEST FOR RESTRAINING ORDERS RE: CIVIL HARASSMENT, FILED BY KAREN NUNN - Minutes | |
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON REQUEST FOR RESTRAINING ORDERS RE: CIVIL HARASSMENT, FILED BY KAREN NUNN - Minutes NOT HEARD/CONT |
|
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
APPLICATION & ORDER FOR RE-ISSUANCE OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER FILED BY KAREN NUNN Not Applicable |
|
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
5CHARP CALENDARED ON 12/02/21 IN DEPT. PITT. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 12/02/21 IN DEPT. 50. Not Applicable |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
FILE RETURNED TO COURT RECORDS, MARTINEZ Not Applicable |
|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON REQUEST TO CONTINUE HEARING FILED *** TRO EXTEN DED TO 12/2/21 ***** Not Applicable |
|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON REQUEST FOR RESTRAINING ORDERS RE: CIVIL HARASSMENT, FILED BY KAREN NUNN - Minutes COMPLETED |
|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF UNSUCCESSFUL SERVICE W/DECL DILIGENCE ATTACHED RE CIVIL HARASSMENT FILED Not Applicable |
|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event | HEARING ON REQUEST FOR RESTRAINING ORDERS RE: CIVIL HARASSMENT, FILED BY KAREN NUNN - Minutes | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
CASE ENTRY COMPLETE Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.