Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lawrence Hardin Sr filed a(n) Elder Abuse - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with Brian F. Haynes presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrian F. Haynes Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 27, 2021 |
CategoryElder/Dependent Adult Abuse |
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeElder Abuse |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON ELDER/DEPENDENT ADULT ABUSE RESTRAINING ORDER - PROTECTED PERSON: LAWRENCE HARDIN SR - Minutes DROPPED BY COURT |
|
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | HEARING ON ELDER/DEPENDENT ADULT ABUSE RESTRAINING ORDER - PROTECTED PERSON: LAWRENCE HARDIN SR - Minutes | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
5EAR CALENDARED ON 12/14/21 IN DEPT. RICH. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 12/14/21 IN DEPT. 03. Not Applicable |
|
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON ELDER/DEPENDENT ADULT ABUSE RESTRAINING ORDER - PROTECTED PERSON: LAWRENCE HARDIN SR - Minutes NOT HEARD/CONT |
|
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | HEARING ON ELDER/DEPENDENT ADULT ABUSE RESTRAINING ORDER - PROTECTED PERSON: LAWRENCE HARDIN SR - Minutes | |
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
5EAR CALENDARED ON 11/09/21 IN DEPT. RICH. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 11/09/21 IN DEPT. 54. Not Applicable Judge: Brian F. Haynes |
|
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
(CIVIL HARASSMENT) PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON ELDER/DEPENDENT ADULT ABUSE FILED 09/27/2021 OF LAWRENCE HARDIN AS TO ROUNG ZHAO, WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/04/21 Not Applicable |
|
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON ELDER/DEPENDENT ADULT ABUSE RESTRAINING ORDER - PROTECTED PERSON: LAWRENCE HARDIN SR - Minutes NOT HEARD/CONT |
|
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON REQUEST TO CONTINUE HEARING ***TRO IN EFFECT UNTIL 11-9-2021*** Not Applicable |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
5EAR CALENDARED ON 10/19/21 IN DEPT. RICH. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 10/19/21 IN DEPT. 03. Not Applicable Judge: Julia Campins |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.