Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Leblanc Consulting, Inc., filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with Julia Campins presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJulia Campins Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 01, 2020 |
CategoryWorkplace Violence |
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 10, 2020 | Docket Event | HEARING ON PETITION/TRO RE: WORKPLACE VIOLENCE, FILED BY LEBLANC CONSULTING,INC. - Minutes | |
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF ORDER ON REQUEST TO CONTINUE HEARING SENT TO ALL PARTIES Not Applicable |
|
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON REQUEST TO CONTINUE HEARING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES Not Applicable |
|
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON PETITION/TRO RE: WORKPLACE VIOLENCE, FILED BY LEBLANC CONSULTING,INC. - Minutes NOT HEARD/CONT |
|
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
(WORKPLACE VIOLENCE) PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON WORKPLACE VIOLENCE PETITION FILED 10/01/2020 OF LEBLANC CONSULTING,INC. AS TO AUSTIN CARRINGTON CARMICHAEL, WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/09/20 Not Applicable |
|
October 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
5WVIOR CALENDARED ON 10/20/20 IN DEPT. RICH. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 10/20/20 IN DEPT. 275. Not Applicable Judge: Julia Campins |
|
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
WE CANNOT FILE/ISSUE YOUR REQUEST TO MODIFY CIVIL HARASSMENT RESTRAINING ORD FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: Not Applicable |
|
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE/ REMOTE FILED BY AUSTIN C CARMICHAEL Not Applicable |
|
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: RESPONSE ON 10-13-20 TO SELENA LE BLANC Not Applicable |
|
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: RESPONSE ON 10130 RE JULIE DUNBAR Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.