Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Gladys Mercado filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 25, 2020 |
CategoryCivil Harassment |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event | HEARING ON REQUEST FOR RESTRAINING ORDERS RE: CIVIL HARASSMENT, FILED BY GLADYS MERCADO - Minutes | |
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF UNSUCCESSFUL SERVICE OF NTC OF HRG, R EQ FOR CIVIL HARASSMENT RE JAMES MILOVALE Not Applicable |
|
October 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER ON REQUEST TO CONTINUE FAXED TO SHERIFF. Not Applicable |
|
October 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
APPLICATION & ORDER FOR RE-ISSUANCE OF TRO FILED BY GLADYS MERCADO Not Applicable |
|
October 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF UNSUCCESSFUL SERVICE FILED Not Applicable |
|
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON REQUEST FOR RESTRAINING ORDERS RE: CIVIL HARASSMENT, FILED BY GLADYS MERCADO - Minutes Complete |
|
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
APPLICATION & ORDER FOR RE-ISSUANCE OF CIVIL HARASSMENT RESTRAINING ORDER FILED BY GLADYS MERCADO Not Applicable |
|
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event | HEARING ON REQUEST FOR CIVIL HARASSMENT RESTRAINING ORDER SCHEDULED FOR 10/15/20 AT 13:30, IN DEPT. %%X% | |
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR CIVIL HARASSMENT RESTRAINING ORDERS FILED Not Applicable |
|
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
COLOR OF FILE IS GRAY Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.