Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Crain, Kari filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts Superior with Julia Campins presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJulia Campins Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 15, 2020 |
CategoryCivil Harassment |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON REQUEST FOR RESTRAINING ORDERS RE: CIVIL HARASSMENT, FILED BY KARI CRAIN - Minutes GRANTED |
|
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING RE: CIVIL HARASSMENT FILED; PROTECTED PERSON: KARI CRAIN / ORDER EXPIRES: 10/06/23 Not Applicable |
|
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
5CHARR CALENDARED ON 10/06/20 IN DEPT. RICH. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 10/06/20 IN DEPT. 278. Not Applicable Judge: Julia Campins |
|
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
(CIVIL HARASSMENT) PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON CIVIL HARASSMENT RO REQUEST FILED 09/15/2020 OF KARI CRAIN AS TO HOLLY RABOLI, WITH SERVICE DATE OF 09/22/20 Not Applicable |
|
September 15, 2020 | Docket Event | HEARING ON REQUEST FOR CIVIL HARASSMENT RESTRAINING ORDER SCHEDULED FOR 10/06/20 AT 8:30, IN DEPT. %%X% | |
September 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
CIVIL HARASSMENT NOTICE OF COURT HEARING FILED Not Applicable |
|
September 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
CIVIL HARASSMENT TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER FILED BY KARI CRAIN Not Applicable |
|
September 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR CIVIL HARASSMENT RESTRAINING ORDERS FILED Not Applicable |
|
September 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
COLOR OF FILE IS PINK Not Applicable |
|
September 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
CASE ENTRY COMPLETE Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.