Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
De La Cruz, Rodrick filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2020 |
CategoryCivil Harassment |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON REQUEST FOR RESTRAINING ORDERS RE: CIVIL HARASSMENT, FILED BY RODRICK DE LA CRUZ - Minutes COMPLETED |
|
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING RE: CIVIL HARASSMENT FILED; PROTECTED PERSON: RODRICK DE LA CRUZ / ORDER EXPIRES: 10/01/23 Not Applicable |
|
September 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON REQUEST FOR RESTRAINING ORDERS RE: CIVIL HARASSMENT, FILED BY RODRICK DE LA CRUZ - Minutes Complete |
|
September 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
APPLICATION & ORDER FOR RE-ISSUANCE OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER FILED BY RODRICK DE LA CRUZ Not Applicable |
|
September 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
(CIVIL HARASSMENT) PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON CIVIL HARASSMENT RO REQUEST FILED 09/14/2020 OF RODRICK DE LA CRUZ AS TO RALPH HERNANDEZ, WITH SERVICE DATE OF 09/17/20 Not Applicable |
|
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR CIVIL HARASSMENT RESTRAINING ORDERS FILED Not Applicable |
|
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
CIVIL HARASSMENT NOTICE OF COURT HEARING FILED Not Applicable |
|
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
CASE ENTRY COMPLETE Not Applicable |
|
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
COLOR OF FILE IS PINK Not Applicable |
|
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
CIVIL HARASSMENT TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER FILED BY RODRICK DE LA CRUZ Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.