Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bill Messer filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with Palvir Shoker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePalvir Shoker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 08, 2020 |
CategoryCivil Harassment |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Case Cycle Time38 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON REQUEST FOR RESTRAINING ORDERS RE: CIVIL HARASSMENT, FILED BY STACEY PITT - Minutes COMPLETED |
|
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE OF BILL MESSER TO PETITION FOR INJUNCTION PROHIBITING HARASSMENT FILED Not Applicable |
|
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
(CIVIL HARASSMENT) PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON CIVIL HARASSMENT RO REQUEST FILED 09/08/2020 OF STACEY PITT AS TO BILL MESSER, WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/03/20 Not Applicable |
|
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION FILED BY STACEY PITT Not Applicable |
|
September 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF UNSUCCESSFUL SERVICE FILED Not Applicable |
|
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON REQUEST FOR RESTRAINING ORDERS RE: CIVIL HARASSMENT, FILED BY STACEY PITT - Minutes NOT HEARD/CONT |
|
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON REQUEST TO CONTINUE HEARING TO 10-16-20 1:30 D57 Not Applicable |
|
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF PALVIR SHOKER AS TEMPORARY JUDGE FILED Not Applicable |
|
September 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR CIVIL HARASSMENT RESTRAINING ORDERS FILED Not Applicable |
|
September 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
CASE ENTRY COMPLETE Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.