Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Jorge Mario Picon, Graciela Gonzalez, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with Lewis A. Davis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLewis A. Davis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2020 |
CategoryPetition For Change Of Name |
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
COPY(IES) AND CERTIFICATION(S) Not Applicable |
|
June 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
DECREE CHANGING NAME FILED Not Applicable |
|
March 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON OSC RE: NAME CHANGE FILED BY GRACIELA GONZALEZ - Minutes COMPLETED |
|
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF OSC FOR CHANGE OF NAME FILED; DATES OF PUBLICATION: 013120. 020720, 021420, 022120 Not Applicable Judge: Lewis A. Davis |
|
January 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
NAME CHANGE TRANSMITTAL RETURNED FROM SHERIFF Not Applicable |
|
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
5OSCC6 CALENDARED ON 03/16/20 IN DEPT. 14. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 03/16/20 IN DEPT. 30. Not Applicable Judge: Patricia M. Scanlon |
|
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON OSC WAS SET FOR 3/16/20 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 14
Judge: John H. Sugiyama |
|
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 14
Judge: John H. Sugiyama |
|
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
CASE ENTRY COMPLETE Not Applicable |
|
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
(U.J.) PETITION TO/FOR CHANGE OF NAME FILED Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.