Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Bellor-Yeh, William, against Walker, Gary D, represented by Lejeune, Cody R., in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts Superior with Clare M. Maier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClare M. Maier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 14, 2020 |
CategoryCollections - Limited Civil ($25,000.00 Or Less) |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT TRIAL - (ONE HOUR) CAUSE/ 0 DAY(S) - Minutes | |
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALT, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION FILED BY DISCOVER BANK - Minutes GRANTED |
|
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 36 TO 09. Not Applicable |
|
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
5MSJC3 CALENDARED ON 01/10/22 IN DEPT. 36. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 01/10/22 IN DEPT. 09. Not Applicable |
|
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
5CTC3 CALENDARED ON 02/14/22 IN DEPT. 36. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 02/14/22 IN DEPT. 09. Not Applicable |
|
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S TICKLER ON CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CASE - CHECK FOR FILING OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN 360 DAYS OF FILING COMPLAINT VACATED |
|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS FILED BY DISCOVER BANK Not Applicable |
|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT WAS SET FOR 1/10/22 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 36 | |
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) FILED BY DISCOVER BANK IN THE AMOUNT OF $937.00 MAILED ON 10/11/21 Not Applicable |
|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
REQUEST OF DISCOVER BANK FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.