Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Quality Loan Service Corp., filed a(n) Real/Personal Property case against David W Edenstrom, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with George V. Spanos presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGeorge V. Spanos Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 25, 2013 |
CategoryReal/Personal Property |
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2021 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions331 days |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 34 TO 12. Not Applicable |
|
March 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
COPIES Not Applicable |
|
February 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF/TO ENTRY OF ORDER TO DEPOSIT SURPLUS FUNDS FILED BY QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORP. Not Applicable |
|
February 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 06 TO 34. Not Applicable |
|
December 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER FOLLOWING HEARING ON PETITION AS TO UNCLAIMED FUNDS FILED, W/CLKS CERT OF MAILING Not Applicable |
|
November 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO DEPOSIT SURPLUS FUNDS PURSUANT TO CCP 2924J(C) & (D) FILED Not Applicable |
|
October 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
HEARING TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION BY JUDGE FLINN COMPLETED |
|
October 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON PETITION RE UNRESOLVED CLAIMS & SURPLUS FUNDS ( FILED BY PETITIONER QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORP) - Minutes SUBMITTED |
|
October 25, 2013 | Docket Event | CLERK`S TICKLER DATE WAS SET FOR 10/25/13 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 06 | |
October 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL: NOTICE OF HEARING SENT TO DAVID W EDENTROM RETURNE D AS NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED; UNABLE TO FWD Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.