Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Old Republic Surety Compny, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Sosa, Carlos E, against Elyse Bell, Adolfo Llamas, Bojan Joze Zajc, Aarene Zajc, Paige M. Devereaux, (total of 7) See All represented by Unrepresented, Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management179 days |
|
Filing DateApril 11, 2013 |
CategoryContract |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions47 days |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time218 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
CHECK FOR DISMISSAL VACATED |
|
November 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION Not Applicable |
|
November 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER ON MTN TO DEPOSIT BY STAKEHOLDER FILED Not Applicable |
|
November 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
CIVIL SAD BEFORE TRIAL - REQ. DISM. - NO ADR Not Applicable |
|
November 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE Not Applicable |
|
November 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON MOTION TO DEPOSIT STAKEHOLDER FILED Not Applicable |
|
November 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
TO 103 - ORDER TO DEPOSIT Not Applicable |
|
October 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
HOLD TO 11/4/13 - ORDER ON MTN TO DEPOSIT Not Applicable |
|
October 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF/TO RULING ON MOTION TO DEPOSIT BY STAKEHOLDER FILED BY OLD REPUBLIC SURETYCOMPNY Not Applicable |
|
October 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Minutes NOT HEARD/CONT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.