Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Portfolio Recoveryassociates,Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Pierce, Emily, against Brandi J Donaldson, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 05, 2012 |
CategoryCollections - Consumer Credit (Crc 3.740) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time398 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON OSC RE: FAILURE TO DISPOSITION CASE - Minutes DISCHARGED |
|
September 16, 2013 | Docket Event | HEARING ON OSC WAS SET FOR 10/08/13 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 31 | |
September 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S TICKLER ON CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CASE - CHECK FOR FILING OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN 360 DAYS OF FILING COMPLAINT OSC ISSUED |
|
March 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S TICKLER ON CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CASE - CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE FILED WITHIN 180 DAYS OF FILING COMPLAINT VACATED |
|
November 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURN OF NON SERVICE FILED ON BRANDI J DONALDSON. FEE FOR NON SERVICE IS $55.00 Not Applicable |
|
October 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURN OF NON SERVICE FILED ON BRANDI J DONALDSON. FEE FOR NON SERVICE IS $55.00 Not Applicable |
|
October 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED BY PLAINTIFF Not Applicable |
|
September 05, 2012 | Docket Event | CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 31 | |
September 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CMPL (CRC 3.740) FILED 09/05/2012 OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC FILED Not Applicable |
|
September 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
COLOR OF FILE: GREEN Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.