Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
American Express Bank, Fsb, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Boulanger, Michael, against Edwin Lopez, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2012 |
CategoryCollections - Consumer Credit (Crc 3.740) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions318 days |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time725 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
CHECK FOR DISMISSAL VACATED |
|
January 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE Not Applicable |
|
January 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION Not Applicable |
|
January 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
CIVIL SAD BEFORE TRIAL - REQ. DISM. - NO ADR Not Applicable |
|
December 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON OSC RE: FAILURE TO DISPOSITION CASE BY PLAINTIFF - Minutes COMPLETED |
|
November 18, 2013 | Docket Event | HEARING ON OSC WAS SET FOR 12/11/13 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 09 | |
January 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S TICKLER ON CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CASE - CHECK FOR FILING OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN 360 DAYS OF FILING COMPLAINT OSC ISSUED |
|
December 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
5CDJC2 CALENDARED ON 01/25/13 IN DEPT. 17. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 01/29/13 IN DEPT. 09. Not Applicable |
|
December 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 17 TO 09. Not Applicable |
|
July 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S TICKLER ON CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CASE - CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE FILED WITHIN 180 DAYS OF FILING COMPLAINT VACATED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.