Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Winn, Brian N, against Jose M Romero, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management141 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2007 |
CategoryCollections - Limited Civil ($25,000.00 Or Less) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions70 days |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time148 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED Not Applicable |
|
January 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT ENTERED Not Applicable |
|
January 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
STATUS OF 0002 JUDGMENT IS SATISFIED Not Applicable |
|
November 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF/TO CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED ON BEHALF OF CAPITAL ONE BANK Not Applicable |
|
November 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED Not Applicable |
|
October 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
COPIES Not Applicable |
|
August 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
CHECK FOR JUDGMENT VACATED |
|
June 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION OF JONATHAN KLEIN FILED RE: INTEREST Not Applicable |
|
June 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT FILED/ENTERED-BEFORE TRIAL ON 06/28/07 Not Applicable |
|
June 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
CHECK FOR JUDGMENT NOT HEARD/CONT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.