Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Abdelfattah, Hisham, filed a(n) case represented by Rolando, Carlo A., against Le, Anh Diep, Woods, Joseph P, represented by Zelezen, Samantha J., in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts Superior with Barry Baskin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarry Baskin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 26, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event | FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Minutes | |
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Minutes COMPLETED |
|
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY HISHAM ABDELFATTAH Not Applicable |
|
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY ANH DIEP LE, JOSEPH P WOODS Not Applicable |
|
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE VACATED |
|
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
(U.J.) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 10/26/2021 OF HISHAM ABDELFATTAH FILED BY ANH DIEP LE, JOSEPH P WOODS Not Applicable |
|
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
ADVANCED NON-REFUNDABLE JURY FEE PAID BY: D & T LEGAL SERVICES LLC, ON BEHALF OF PARTY: ANH DIEP LE, JOSEPH P WOODS Not Applicable |
|
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED Not Applicable |
|
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 07 | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 3/22/22 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 07 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.