Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Calaveras Materials, Inc, filed a(n) 42: Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) case represented by Townsend, Michael S, against M.C.M. Construction, Inc, represented by Puchi, Edmundo A, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with Fannin, Jill C presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFannin, Jill C Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management159 days |
Filing DateJune 14, 2013 |
Category42: Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 05, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions560 days |
|
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
||
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time854 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
COPIES Not Applicable |
|
November 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
CHECK FOR DISMISSAL ON CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT VACATED |
|
October 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial SHORT+3+ |
|
October 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
JURY TRIAL - SHORT CAUSE/ 3 DAY(S) VACATED |
|
October 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Entire action dismissed with prejudice REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION CSADBT: Civil SAD Before Trial - ACMT%%. WP: With Prejudice |
|
October 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION Not Applicable |
|
September 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Issue Conference | |
September 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
ISSUE CONFERENCE - Minutes ADVANCED |
|
September 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
ISSUE CONFERENCE VACATED |
|
September 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
*Conditional Settlement Filed CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT/DISMISSAL FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.