Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Thunberbolt Holdings Ltd Llc, filed a(n) 42: Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) case represented by Quall, Matthew W., against Joyce B Benton, Joyce Benton, represented by Coad-Hermelin, Heidi, Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with Brady, Laurel S presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrady, Laurel S Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management159 days |
Filing DateJanuary 23, 2013 |
Category42: Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 03, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
||
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time607 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Hearing SHORT+1+ |
|
November 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
COURT TRIAL - SHORT CAUSE/ 1 DAY(S) VACATED |
|
November 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Hearing SHORT+1+ |
|
November 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
COURT TRIAL - SHORT CAUSE/ 1 DAY(S) - Minutes CONTINUED |
|
September 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Entire action dismissed with prejudice REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION CSADBT: Civil SAD Before Trial - NADT%%. WP: With Prejudice |
|
September 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION Not Applicable |
|
January 17, 2014 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED. MWR30/ SUBSTITUTES OUT AS ATTORNEY FOR THUNBERBOLT HOLDING, S LTD LLC AND IS REPLACED BY MWQ/ | |
January 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED. MICHAEL W REICH SUBSTITUTES OUT AS ATTORNEY FOR THUNBERBOLT HOLDINGS LTD LLC AND IS REPLACED BY MATTHEW W. QUALL Not Applicable |
|
October 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF NOTICE OF HEARING-COURT TRIAL SENT TO ALL PARTIES *NOT: NOTICE PRINTED FOR MWR30/ ON 10/09/13 *NOT: NOTICE PRINTED FOR HCH/ ON 10/09/13 |
|
October 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Order to Show Cause in Re: WHY CASE SHOULD+FAILURE TO APPEAR ON 8/21/13 AND PROSECUTE CASE+ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.