Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Calderon, Ever A, Calderon, Santos, Gutierrez, Alexandra M, Vasquez-Gonzalez, Lizbeth G, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mount, John H., against Smith, Paulus Charles, represented by Patton, Christopher L, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with Treat, Charles S presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTreat, Charles S Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management133 days |
Filing DateNovember 06, 2012 |
Category22: Unlimited Auto |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions13 days |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 05, 2017 | Docket Event | Default Department was changed from 34 to 12. | |
May 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 34 TO 12. Not Applicable |
|
February 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Default Department was changed from 06 to 34. | |
February 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 06 TO 34. Not Applicable |
|
January 07, 2014 | Docket Event | *Further Case Management Conference | |
January 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE VACATED |
|
October 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Order to Show Cause in Re: SANCTIONS OF $350.00 RE ATTY MOUNT+FTA ON 8/7/13+ |
|
October 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON OSC RE: SANCTIONS OF $350.00 RE ATTY MOUNT FTA ON 8/7/13 - Minutes DISCHARGED |
|
September 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Entire action dismissed with prejudice REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION CSADBT: Civil SAD Before Trial - NADT%%. |
|
September 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.