Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Greenberg, Mildred, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Gerard, Audrey J, against Mayer, Lynne, represented by Bjonerud, Deborah T, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts Superior with Treat, Charles S presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTreat, Charles S Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 05, 2010 |
Category22: Unlimited Auto |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions797 days |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time797 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 05, 2017 | Docket Event | Default Department was changed from 34 to 12. | |
May 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 34 TO 12. Not Applicable |
|
March 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
CHECK FOR PICK UP EXHIBITS IN DEPT 34 (FOR DEPT 6) VACATED |
|
February 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Default Department was changed from 06 to 34. | |
February 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 06 TO 34. Not Applicable |
|
January 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Clerk`s tickler was set for 3/24/14 at 17:00 in Dept34 | |
January 21, 2014 | Docket Event | CLERK`S TICKLER WAS SET FOR 3/24/14 AT 17:00 IN DEPT 34 | |
January 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF clks ntc intent to destroy exhbts, depos, subpoena SENT TO ALL ACTIVE AND DISPO`D PARTIES. *NOT: NOTICE PRINTED FOR AJG/ ON 1/17/14 *NOT: NOTICE PRINTED FOR WJD3 /WJD ON 1/17/14 *NOT: NOTICE PRINTED FOR DTB10/ ON 1/17/14 |
|
January 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF CLKS NTC INTENT TO DESTROY EXHBTS, DEPOS, SUBPOENA SENT TO ALL ACTIVE AND DISPO`D PARTIES. Not Applicable |
|
April 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication Filed SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.