Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Field, Andrew, Field, Bonnie, Field Properties, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Horner, Clifford R, against Commercial Real Estate Services, Crs, David Granger, Gomes, Brian, Gomes, Bruce, (total of 6) See All represented by Bedford, Lyman D, Merrill, Charles E, Unrepresented, Van Wert, Christina R, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with Jon R. Rolefson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJon R. Rolefson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 17, 2008 |
CategoryContract/Breach Of Warranty |
Last RefreshedMarch 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Cycle Time852 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 11, 2013 | Docket Event | RETURN WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED ON 02/18/11 TO ALA COUNTY FILED. RETURNED NOT SATISFIED. IF PARTIAL, SUM OF $0.00 | |
June 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
RETURN WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED ON 02/18/11 TO ALAMEDA COUNTY FILED. RETURNED NOT SATISFIED. IF PARTIAL, SUM OF $0.00 Not Applicable |
|
December 28, 2011 | Docket Event | RETURN WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED ON 02/18/11 TO Contra Costa COUNTY FILED. RETURNED NOT SATISFIED. IF PARTIAL, SUM OF $0.00 | |
December 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
RETURN WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED ON 02/18/11 TO CONTRA COSTA COUNTY FILED. RETURNED NOT SATISFIED. IF PARTIAL, SUM OF $0.00 Not Applicable |
|
December 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
COPIES Not Applicable |
|
September 12, 2011 | Docket Event | RETURN WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED ON 03/01/11 TO SF COUNTY FILED. RETURNED NOT SATISFIED. IF PARTIAL, SUM OF $2,968,400.51 | |
September 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
RETURN WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED ON 03/01/11 TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY FILED. RETURNED NOT SATISFIED. IF PARTIAL, SUM OF $2,968,400.51 Not Applicable |
|
June 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
COPIES Not Applicable |
|
May 31, 2011 | Docket Event | *Order of Examination: Non-Appealed Case | |
May 31, 2011 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON ORDER OF EXAMINATION AS TO THE GOMES PARTNERSHIP - Minutes DROPPED BY COURT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.