Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Alameda-Contra Costa Transit District, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Briggs, Ronald L., against All Star Glass, Inc., Jose Luis Hernandez, represented by Altura, Judith B., Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management140 days |
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2005 |
Category22: Unlimited Auto |
Last RefreshedMarch 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time190 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 13, 2005 | Docket Event | *Further Case Management Conference | |
September 13, 2005 | Docket Event |
FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE VACATED |
|
September 01, 2005 | Docket Event |
Entire action dismissed with prejudice REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION CSADBT: Civil SAD Before Trial - NADT%%. EAW: Entire Action Dismissed With Prejudice |
|
September 01, 2005 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION Not Applicable |
|
August 23, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice of/to: NOTICE OF/TO UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED ON BEHALF OF ALAMEDA-CONTRA COST, A TRANSIT DI STRICT |
|
August 23, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF/TO UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED ON BEHALF OF ALAMEDA-CONTRA COSTA TRANSIT DISTRICT Not Applicable |
|
July 13, 2005 | Docket Event | *Case Management Conference | |
July 13, 2005 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Minutes COMPLETED |
|
July 05, 2005 | Docket Event |
CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT VACATED |
|
June 30, 2005 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BYALAMEDA-CONTRA COST, A TRANSIT DI STRICT DD: NON-JURY Trial Requested, Time Estimate: 2 DAYS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.