Case Last Refreshed: 17 hours ago
Ortiz, Jasen, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Jaurigue Law Group, against Tlc Contents Restoration, Inc., Tlc Restoration, Inc A California Corporation, represented by Clark Hill Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Cohn, David presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCohn, David Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 17, 2020 |
CategoryWrongful Termination Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Motion to Compel Further Responses to Form Interrogatories
Date: July 28, 2021Notice Imaged
Date: June 22, 2020Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests Prod of Docs
Date: July 28, 2021Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Admission
Date: July 28, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: July 28, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 29, 2021Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatorie
Date: July 28, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: June 17, 2020Answer Filed
Date: August 13, 2020Order Filed Re:
Date: June 22, 2020Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: June 17, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: July 16, 2020Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Admission
Date: July 28, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: June 17, 2020Stipulation & Order filed
Date: August 26, 2021Notice Filed Re:
Date: September 09, 2020Separate Statement Filed
Date: July 28, 2021Status Report Filed
Date: November 23, 2021Response Filed to:
Date: September 30, 2021Response Filed to:
Date: September 29, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: July 28, 2021Tentative decisions
Date: October 13, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: July 30, 2021Reply Filed
Date: October 06, 2021Notice Filed
Date: September 03, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: September 29, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: November 23, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: October 06, 2021Tentative decisions
Date: October 12, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: November 23, 2021Motion re:
Date: November 23, 2021Tentative decisions
Date: April 12, 2022Stipulation and Order Filed
Date: February 01, 2022Joint Case Mngmnt Conference Statement Filed Electronically
Date: November 29, 2023Ex Parte Application
Date: April 25, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: April 12, 2022Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: February 03, 2022Notice Filed
Date: March 19, 2024Notice Filed
Date: April 18, 2023Proof of Service Filed
Date: April 25, 2022Separate Statement Filed
Date: July 28, 2021Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: June 17, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 30, 2021Response Filed to:
Date: September 30, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 30, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: July 28, 2021Reply Filed
Date: October 06, 2021Reply Filed
Date: October 05, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: July 28, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: September 30, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: September 30, 2021Response Filed to:
Date: September 30, 2021Reply Filed
Date: October 06, 2021Notice Filed Re:
Date: October 01, 2021Motion to Compel
Date: November 23, 2021Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: January 17, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 06, 2021Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Admission
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Responses to Form Interrogatories
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests Prod of Docs
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Admission
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatorie
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Response Filed to:
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Reply Filed
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Reply Filed
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Reply Filed
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2024 |
Department S26 - SBJC
Judge: Morgan, Jessica |
||
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING RE: STATUS OF FILING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL |
|
December 06, 2023 |
Department S26 - SBJC
Judge: Morgan, Jessica |
||
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Joint Case Mngmnt Conference Statement Filed Electronically Joint Status Report |
|
August 09, 2023 |
Department S26 - SBJC
Judge: Morgan, Jessica |
||
May 03, 2023 |
Department S26 - SBJC
Judge: Morgan, Jessica |
||
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed of Related Case |
|
January 18, 2023 |
Department S26 - SBJC
Judge: Morgan, Jessica |
||
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Appearance | |
December 29, 2022 |
Department S26 - SBJC
Judge: Cohn, David |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.