Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Foladpour, Foroud, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Pro Se, against City Of Upland 480 North Euclid Ave Upland Ca, 91786, represented by Carpenter Rothans & Dumont, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with John M Pacheco presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn M Pacheco Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 19, 2019 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Non-Motor Vehicle Unlimited |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Motion Filed
Date: September 05, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: November 07, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 30, 2021Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: February 24, 2021Notice Imaged
Date: February 19, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: February 19, 2019Notice Imaged
Date: April 15, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: September 16, 2020Order Filed Re:
Date: November 06, 2020Ex Parte Application
Date: January 19, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 30, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 30, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: April 16, 2021Motion Filed
Date: January 03, 2020Reply Filed
Date: July 07, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 16, 2020Order Filed Re:
Date: July 20, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: February 08, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 30, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 19, 2020Response Filed to:
Date: March 11, 2021Clerk's Notification of Filing Of Notice of Appeal Filed
Date: June 08, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: May 04, 2021Reply Filed
Date: August 16, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 04, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 05, 2020Received an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date
Date: April 20, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: August 04, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: October 22, 2020Judgment - Summary
Date: February 02, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: July 23, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: August 02, 2019Summons Issued and Filed
Date: February 19, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: August 27, 2019Ex Parte Filed
Date: October 21, 2019Order Filed Re:
Date: October 24, 2019Notice Imaged
Date: March 16, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 30, 2020Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: October 29, 2019Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: October 27, 2020Order Filed Re:
Date: November 08, 2019Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: November 15, 2019Motion Filed
Date: September 05, 2019Order on Court Fee Waiver Denied Filed
Date: October 31, 2019Answer Filed
Date: June 20, 2019Separate Statement Filed
Date: March 26, 2021Motion re:
Date: April 30, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: October 22, 2020Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted by Clerk
Date: March 08, 2023Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: July 13, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: December 05, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 24, 2020Motion Filed
Date: September 15, 2020Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: March 11, 2021Notice Imaged
Date: August 12, 2020Order Filed Re:
Date: August 12, 2020Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: March 26, 2021Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: July 20, 2020Declaration re:
Date: February 17, 2021Reply Filed
Date: March 29, 2021Declaration re:
Date: February 17, 2021Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted Filed
Date: February 19, 2019Motion Filed
Date: September 11, 2020Order Filed Re:
Date: August 27, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: April 11, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 30, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: February 23, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 30, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: May 27, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: October 17, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 30, 2021Notice Imaged
Date: October 30, 2019Separate Statement Filed
Date: May 27, 2021Notice Filed Re:
Date: October 10, 2019Received an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date
Date: March 25, 2022Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: October 22, 2019Proof of Electronic Service
Date: November 29, 2023Order signed and Filed
Date: May 27, 2021Notice Filed Re:
Date: December 05, 2019Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Denied
Date: July 23, 2021Reply Filed
Date: July 28, 2021Prefiling Order re: Vexatious Litigant Signed by Court
Date: December 19, 2019Received an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date
Date: March 13, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: February 16, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 18, 2020Ex Parte Filed
Date: November 05, 2020Clerk's Notification of Filing Of Notice of Appeal Filed
Date: March 08, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 22, 2021Motion to Compel
Date: March 26, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: November 05, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 30, 2021Received an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date
Date: June 25, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: August 19, 2021Motion Filed Re:
Date: November 09, 2023Received an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date
Date: April 29, 2022Notice of Appeal - Court of Appeal
Date: March 08, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: September 02, 2021Comment:
Date: February 28, 2022Motion Filed
Date: October 25, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 25, 2019Appellant's Notice Designating Record on Appeal
Date: June 08, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: June 11, 2021Notice Filed Re:
Date: September 09, 2020Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: October 18, 2019Motion Filed
Date: October 25, 2019Ex Parte Filed
Date: July 22, 2020Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: October 18, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 25, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: October 22, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 28, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: June 15, 2020Amended Document Filed re:
Date: June 17, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 16, 2020Motion re:
Date: March 05, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 03, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: June 18, 2021Respondent's Notice Designating Record on Appeal filed
Date: June 14, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: December 11, 2019Order Filed Re:
Date: October 28, 2020Ex Parte Filed Re:
Date: October 18, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: February 19, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: August 27, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 05, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: January 14, 2021Motion to Compel Responses to Requests for Production of Doc
Date: July 08, 2021Notice of Appeal on Order or Motion Filed - Court of Appeal
Date: June 08, 2021App for Ordr to Vacate Prefiling Ordr and Remove from Vex
Date: November 09, 2023Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: February 19, 2019Response Filed to:
Date: July 21, 2021Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: February 19, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: May 06, 2021Notice Filed
Date: February 01, 2021Motion Filed
Date: March 06, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: October 23, 2019Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: May 27, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: April 21, 2021Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: February 17, 2021Notice
Date: October 23, 2020Received an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date
Date: November 05, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 15, 2023 |
Department S31 - SBJC
Judge: Pacheco, John M |
||
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Electronic Service 4 pags "Order to Show Cause Motions" VL 120 Form VL 125 |
|
November 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Filed Re: Order to Show Cause to vacate the 12/19/19 Judgment asking Court to Vacating his court order |
|
November 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
App for Ordr to Vacate Prefiling Ordr and Remove from Vex Litigant List |
|
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Received an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date Appellant's request for permission to file appeal under CCP section 391.7 is DENIED. |
|
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Received an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date Appellant is DIRECTED to serve & filed, w/in 15 days, a request for permission to file. Additionally, appellant is DIRECTED to submit a correctly completed civil case information statement. |
|
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted by Clerk | |
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notification of Filing Of Notice of Appeal Filed Sent to parties |
|
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appeal - Court of Appeal E080854 Against respondent in 2nd appeal from multiple items. |
|
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Request to Waive Court Fees Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.