Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Mora, Cesario, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Ackermann & Tilajef, against The Complete Logistics Company , A California Corporation, represented by Binder And Kalioundji Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with David S. Cohn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid S. Cohn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryEmployment-Other-Complex |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time406 days |
Summons Issued and Filed
Date: December 31, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: December 31, 2018Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: December 31, 2018Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: January 30, 2019Notice Imaged
Date: February 28, 2019Proof of Service Filed. Type of Service is:
Date: June 28, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: July 01, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: August 26, 2019Notice Imaged
Date: November 10, 2020Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: February 02, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: February 11, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: February 11, 2021Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed
Date: March 18, 2021Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: March 04, 2021Amended Order Filed
Date: May 17, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.