Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Benson Legal Apc, against Signorelli, Julian Gino, represented by Baraban & Teske, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Lynn M. Poncin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLynn M. Poncin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2018 |
CategoryPersonal Injury-Motor Vehicle (Ltd) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is filed by Susan M. Benson of Benson Legal APC on behalf of the plaintiff, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. The complaint is filed in the Superior Court of California, County of San Bernardino. The file number for this ...
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: December 28, 2018Answer Filed
Date: March 27, 2019Complaint Filed
Date: December 28, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes COURT TRIAL SET FOR COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE |
|
September 23, 2020 | |||
July 10, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S) | |
July 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): PREVIOUSLY DISMISSED AS OF 062220. |
|
June 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes MOTION RE: TO STRIKE ANSWER FOR NON-COMPLIANCE OF COURT ORDER |
|
June 23, 2020 | |||
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER FILED BY STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE. |
|
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Vacate Hearing Scheduled VACATE LM37 HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 06/23/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17S. |
|
April 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes MOTION RE: TO STRIKE ANSWER FOR NONCOMPLIANCE OF COURT ORDER FILED BY PLAINTIFF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.