Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Benson Legal Apc, against Vasquez, Reyes Zamora, represented by Law Offices Of Brian P Smith & Associates, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Barry L. Plotkin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarry L. Plotkin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2018 |
CategoryPersonal Injury - Motor Vehicle (Ltd - 10K To 25K) |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time395 days |
Request for Dismissal Filed
Date: January 27, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: December 28, 2018Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: July 02, 2019Notice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Conditional)
Date: January 13, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: December 27, 2019Legacy Minutes
Date: June 28, 2019Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: December 28, 2018Summons Issued and Filed
Date: December 28, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2020 | |||
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes COURT TRIAL SET FOR COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) OF STATE FARM MUTUAL A ANYUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMP |
|
February 24, 2020 | |||
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: DISMISSAL |
|
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
January 16, 2020 | |||
January 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes VOLUNTARY CIVIL MEDIATION SESSION |
|
January 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Conditional) NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY STATE FARM MUTUAL A ANYUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMP. |
|
January 13, 2020 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY STATE FARM MUTUAL A ANYUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMP FOR FAX FEES 200115-0213-MC FAX/ 3.00 PAYMT 200115-0213-MC REFERENCE NUMBER 034-0001692190 | |
January 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Vacate Hearing Scheduled VACATE VCMS HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 01/16/20 AT 01:30 IN DEPARTMENT S34. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.