Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Pmgi Financial, Llca Limited Liability Company, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Law Office Of Kenosian & Miele, Llp, against Soria, Mario, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Barry L. Plotkin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarry L. Plotkin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2018 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections - Reduced Filing Fee Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Dismissal Filed as to Does Only
Date: September 23, 2020Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: December 28, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: December 28, 2018Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2022 | Hearing | Filing Fee Paid by Comment $40 check paid on 1/11/22 for Abstract of Judgment | |
January 11, 2022 | Hearing | Abstract of Judgment Issued | |
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $40 check paid on 1/11/22 for Abstract of Judgment |
|
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment Issued | |
August 05, 2021 | Hearing | Abstract of Judgment Issued | |
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment Issued | |
December 01, 2020 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Comment ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
December 01, 2020 | Hearing | Order to Show Cause - Predisposition Original Type Order to Show Cause - Predisposition Hearing Time 09:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
December 01, 2020 | |||
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.