Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Fair, Robert, Longbotham, Kathleen, Powell, Catherine, Powell, Madison, Soderberg, Mya, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Law Offices Of Gerald S. Ohn, Apc, against Bonnie Fiske, Individually And As Personal Representative Of The Estate Of Michael, Charboneau, Peter, represented by Law Offices Of J Alan Plott Apc, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Brian S McCarville presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrian S McCarville Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions239 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: April 29, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: December 31, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: December 31, 2018Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Stipulation & Order filed
Date: November 03, 2021Notice Filed
Date: December 10, 2021Stipulation & Order filed
Date: February 24, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.